MN HF1338 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Author added West.
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Author added West.
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Third-party reimbursement for special education evaluation modified.
Title
Third-party reimbursement for special education evaluation modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Thissen [D] | Rep. Jenifer Loon [R] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] |
Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Erin Koegel [D] | Rep. Ron Kresha [R] | Rep. Nolan West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Author added West. |
2017-03-20 | House | Author added Kresha. |
2017-03-15 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Education Finance |
2017-03-13 | House | Author added Baker and Koegel. |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1207 (Similar To) 2017-03-14 - Withdrawn and re-referred to E-12 Finance