MN HF1310 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Authors added Hemmingsen-Jaeger and Moller
Pending: House Workforce Development Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Youthbuild program funding provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youthbuild program funding provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-27HouseAuthors added Hemmingsen-Jaeger and Moller
2023-02-08HouseAuthor added Pinto
2023-02-06HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Workforce Development Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1693 (Similar To) 2023-02-16 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Development

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback