MN HF1298 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Point of order raised, ruled well taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Point of order raised, ruled well taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Personal care service provider minimum wage provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Personal care service provider minimum wage provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2020-02-24 | House | House rule 4.31, notice of request to return bill to the house |
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Masin |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Long-Term Care Division |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2135 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy