MN HF1293 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Open air swine basin ban extended.
Title
Open air swine basin ban extended.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Fabian [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | House | Second reading |
2017-03-06 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2017-02-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1093 (Similar To) 2017-03-14 - Author added Ingebrigtsen