MN HF1265 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-13 - Author added Hertaus.
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-13 - Author added Hertaus.
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cities provided dedicated aid to fund transportation costs.
Title
Cities provided dedicated aid to fund transportation costs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | House | Author added Hertaus. |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division |
2015-03-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2015-03-16 | House | Author added Backer. |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Policy and Finance |