MN HF1262 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Author added Hamilton.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Author added Hamilton.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dental service payment rate increased for medical assistance and MinnesotaCare.
Title
Dental service payment rate increased for medical assistance and MinnesotaCare.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Cindy Pugh [R] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | Author added Hamilton. |
2017-02-27 | House | Author added Pugh. |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF797 (Similar To) 2017-02-09 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy