MN HF1256 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adult foster care and community residential setting license capacity modified, and various provisions governing home and community-based services modified.
Title
Adult foster care and community residential setting license capacity modified, and various provisions governing home and community-based services modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Ruth Richardson [D] | Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] |
Rep. Joe Schomacker [R] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Olson |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF174 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Second reading