MN HF1241 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Call Center Jobs Act; call center or customer service operation relocation notice required, and recapture of public subsidies provided.
Title
Minnesota Call Center Jobs Act; call center or customer service operation relocation notice required, and recapture of public subsidies provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. Erin Koegel [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] |
Rep. Anne Claflin [D] | Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Julie Sandstede [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Labor |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF2447 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy