MN HF1239 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Referred by Chair to Legacy Finance Division
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Health commissioner directed to test for contaminants in surface water used as drinking water, identification and implementation of source water protection strategies required, health commissioner directed to adopt health risk limits for certain substances, reports required, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health commissioner directed to test for contaminants in surface water used as drinking water, identification and implementation of source water protection strategies required, health commissioner directed to adopt health risk limits for certain substances, reports required, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseReferred by Chair to Legacy Finance Division
2019-03-20HouseAuthor added Bierman
2019-03-19HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-03-07HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-07HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-04HouseAuthor added Mann
2019-02-28HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
2019-02-21HouseAuthor added Huot
2019-02-18HouseAuthor added Sandell
2019-02-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF2891 (Similar To) 2019-05-17 - Author added Wiger

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback