MN HF1197 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Keeler
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Keeler
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pregnant women and family home visiting program established, and money appropriated.
Title
Pregnant women and family home visiting program established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Keeler |
2021-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2021-02-25 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Early Childhood Finance and Policy |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1360 (Similar To) 2021-03-24 - Author added Housley