MN HF119 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Author added Pierson.
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Author added Pierson.
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Deceased veteran's spouse benefit eligibility modified.
Title
Deceased veteran's spouse benefit eligibility modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] |
Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. Brian Daniels [R] | Rep. Regina Barr [R] | Rep. Cindy Pugh [R] |
Rep. Joshua Heintzeman [R] | Rep. Nels Pierson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Author added Pierson. |
2017-03-27 | House | Author added Heintzeman. |
2017-02-27 | House | Author added Pugh. |
2017-02-09 | House | Author added Barr, R. |
2017-02-06 | House | Author added Daniels. |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division |
2017-01-26 | House | Author added Lueck. |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2017-01-23 | House | Authors added Poston and Davids. |
2017-01-11 | House | Author added Howe. |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans Affairs Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF84 (Similar To) 2017-02-06 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes