MN HF1182 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Author added Jurgens.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Author added Jurgens.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Parental contribution amounts for services for children with disabilities modified.
Title
Parental contribution amounts for services for children with disabilities modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Roz Peterson [R] | Sen. Erin Maye Quade [D] | Rep. Jenifer Loon [R] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] |
Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Matthew Dean [R] | Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] |
Rep. Jon Koznick [R] | Rep. Dario Anselmo [R] | Rep. Joe McDonald [R] | Rep. Peggy Flanagan [D] |
Rep. Erin Koegel [D] | Sen. Erin Murphy [D] | Rep. Laurie Pryor [D] | Rep. Andrew Carlson [D] |
Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] |
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Nolan West [R] | Rep. Nels Pierson [R] | Rep. Sheldon Johnson [D] |
Rep. Susan Allen [D] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Kelly Fenton [R] |
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Paul Rosenthal [D] | Rep. Tina Liebling [D] | Rep. JoAnn Ward [D] |
Rep. Anna Wills [R] | Rep. Cindy Pugh [R] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Author added Jurgens. |
2017-03-20 | House | Author added Pugh. |
2017-03-16 | House | Authors added Ward and Wills. |
2017-03-08 | House | Author added Liebling. |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2017-03-02 | House | Author added Rosenthal. |
2017-03-01 | House | Authors added Fenton and Pinto. |
2017-02-27 | House | Author added Lucero. |
2017-02-20 | House | Authors added Allen and Omar. |
2017-02-16 | House | Author added Johnson, S. |
2017-02-15 | House | Authors added Freiberg, West, and Pierson. |
2017-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF807 (Similar To) 2017-02-09 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy