MN HF117 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Author added Bahr, C.
Pending: House Transportation Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Author added Bahr, C.
Pending: House Transportation Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Anoka County; I-35W and Lake Drive interchange improvement and realignment funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Anoka County; I-35W and Lake Drive interchange improvement and realignment funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Mark Uglem [R] | Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Author added Bahr, C. |
2017-02-01 | House | Author added Runbeck. |
2017-01-11 | House | Author added Uglem. |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF57 (Similar To) 2017-01-09 - Referred to Capital Investment