MN HF1160 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Omnibus judiciary finance and policy bill.
Title
Omnibus judiciary finance and policy bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-19 - House - House: Passage (Y: 71 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 55 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 55 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 57 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 57 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 55 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 55 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 57 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 57 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2013-05-19 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 66-0 |
2013-05-19 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2013-05-19 | Senate | Taken from table |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Laid on table |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Taken from table |
2013-04-20 | Senate | Laid on table |
2013-04-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2013-04-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-04-19 | House | Bill was passed vote: 71-59 |
2013-04-19 | House | Third reading |
2013-04-19 | House | Amendments offered |
2013-04-17 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, April 19, 2013 |
2013-04-15 | House | Second reading |
2013-04-15 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2013-04-10 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2013-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Policy |