MN HF1147 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Author added Torkelson
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Author added Torkelson
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small city assistance program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Small city assistance program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Bjorn Olson [R] | Rep. Donald Raleigh [R] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. Jerry Hertaus [R] |
Rep. Paul Torkelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Author added Torkelson |
2021-02-18 | House | Author added Hertaus |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1603 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy