MN HF1135 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Dispensed prescriptions additional information required.
Title
Dispensed prescriptions additional information required.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Debra Hilstrom [D] | Rep. Ron Kresha [R] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] |
Rep. Tama Theis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | House | Second reading |
2017-02-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-02-15 | House | Author added Theis. |
2017-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF751 (Similar To) 2017-05-10 - Second reading