MN HF112 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Boldon
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Boldon
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Manufactured home park residents provided purchase opportunity.
Title
Manufactured home park residents provided purchase opportunity.
Sponsors
Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Rep. Michael Howard [D] | Rep. Ryan Winkler [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] |
Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] | Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Sen. Liz Boldon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Boldon |
2021-03-22 | House | Author added Feist |
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Jordan |
2021-03-08 | House | Second reading |
2021-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt Motion adopted by voice vote. |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2021-02-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Commerce Finance and Policy |
2021-02-22 | House | Author added Winkler |
2021-02-01 | House | Author added Howard |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1282 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Author added Kunesh