MN HF1080 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - House: Author added Benson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - House: Author added Benson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Comprehensive scientifically based reading instruction definition clarified, prekindergarten through grade six teachers requirements made, reading instruction assessment created, and Board of Teaching rules legislative review provided.
Title
Comprehensive scientifically based reading instruction definition clarified, prekindergarten through grade six teachers requirements made, reading instruction assessment created, and Board of Teaching rules legislative review provided.
Sponsors
Rep. John Benson [D] | Rep. Connie Doepke [R] | Rep. Margaret Kelliher [D] | Rep. Carol McFarlane [R] |
Rep. Kim Norton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | House: Author added Benson | |
2009-03-16 | House: Author added Kelliher | |
2009-03-12 | House: Author added Doepke | |
2009-02-23 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to K-12 Education Policy and Oversight |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF1080&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF1080.0.pdf |