MN HF1078 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-17 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus public safety bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus public safety bill.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-17HouseHF indefinitely postponed
2021-04-17HouseBills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
2021-04-16HouseReferred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF970
2021-04-16HouseSecond reading
2021-04-16HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2021-02-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1115 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Chief author added Latz
SF970 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - House conferees Mariani; Becker-Finn; Moller; Frazier; Miller

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback