MN HF1059 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-20 - Author added Hussein
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-20 - Author added Hussein
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grants supporting healthy development of babies during pregnancy and postpartum for families with members who are Black, Indigenous, and People of Color funding provided; and money appropriated.
Title
Grants supporting healthy development of babies during pregnancy and postpartum for families with members who are Black, Indigenous, and People of Color funding provided; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Richardson [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Amanda Hemmingsen-Jaeger [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] |
Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Rep. Samakab Hussein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-20 | House | Author added Hussein |
2023-02-08 | House | Author added Bahner |
2023-02-06 | House | Author added Fischer |
2023-02-01 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2023-01-30 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1274 (Similar To) 2023-02-06 - Referred to Health and Human Services