MN HF1056 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Author added Lueck
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Author added Lueck
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Right of the people to keep and bear arms protected, and constitutional amendment proposed.
Title
Right of the people to keep and bear arms protected, and constitutional amendment proposed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | Author added Lueck |
2021-03-17 | House | Author added Mekeland |
2021-03-01 | House | Authors added Poston, Albright and Gruenhagen |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Bennett, Franson and Nash |
2021-02-18 | House | Author added Hertaus |
2021-02-15 | House | Author added Munson |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2328 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Authors added Dornink; Draheim