MN HF1054 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-20 - Author added Applebaum.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-20 - Author added Applebaum.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Housing funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Housing funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Author added Applebaum. |
2015-03-26 | House | Author added Fischer. |
2015-03-16 | House | Authors added Pinto and Allen. |
2015-03-12 | House | Authors added Lenczewski and Kahn. |
2015-03-05 | House | Authors added Hausman and Wagenius. |
2015-03-04 | House | Author added Erhardt. |
2015-03-02 | House | Author added Bly. |
2015-02-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF551 (Similar To) 2015-02-05 - Referred to Finance