MN HF1010 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Governor's action Veto Chapter 46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Governor's action Veto Chapter 46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Omnibus environment, energy, and natural resources finance bill.
Title
Omnibus environment, energy, and natural resources finance bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - House - Repassage, as amended by Conference committee (Y: 72 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - McNamara motion - Adoption (Y: 72 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - Thissen motion - postpone (Y: 49 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 72 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Amendment (Y: 113 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Amendment - second portion (Y: 57 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - Amendment - first portion (Y: 46 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - Amendment (Y: 55 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - Amendment (Y: 54 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - Amendment (Y: 61 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - Amendment (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - Amendment - first portion (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Amendment (Y: 106 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - McNamara motion - Adoption (Y: 72 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - Thissen motion - postpone (Y: 49 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 72 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Amendment (Y: 113 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Amendment - second portion (Y: 57 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - Amendment - first portion (Y: 46 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - Amendment (Y: 55 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - Amendment (Y: 54 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - Amendment (Y: 61 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - Amendment (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - Amendment - first portion (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Amendment (Y: 106 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Governor's action Veto Chapter 46 | |
2011-05-24 | Governor veto | |
2011-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | House | Senate concurrence and repassage vote: 35-28 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Third reading vote: 35-28 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Senate concurred and repassed bill |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2011-05-19 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2011-05-18 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 72-61 |
2011-05-18 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2011-05-18 | House | House adopted conference committee report vote: 72-61 |
2011-05-18 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2011-05-18 | House | Motion to adopt conference committee report |
2011-05-18 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2011-05-17 | House | Reported to the House |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate conferees Ingebrigtsen; Rosen; Pederson; Gerlach; Dahms |
2011-04-11 | House | Senate conferees Ingebrigtsen, Rosen, Pederson, Gerlach, Dahms |
2011-04-11 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2011-04-04 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2011-04-04 | Senate | House conferees McNamara; Hackbarth; Torkelson; Hoppe; Dill |
2011-04-04 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2011-03-31 | House | House conferees McNamara; Hackbarth; Torkelson; Hoppe; Dill. |
2011-03-31 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2011-03-31 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 36-28 |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Amended [SF1029] |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Special Order |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Taken from table |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Laid on table |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Taken from table |
2011-03-29 | Senate | Laid on table |
2011-03-29 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2011-03-29 | Senate | Received from House |
2011-03-29 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 72-57 |
2011-03-29 | House | Third reading as amended |
2011-03-29 | House | Amended |
2011-03-28 | House | House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar |
2011-03-28 | House | Second reading |
2011-03-28 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2011-03-24 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2011-03-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment, Energy and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |