MN HF1007 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State agency criteria required to be met before suing a local government.
Title
State agency criteria required to be met before suing a local government.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Howe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2018-03-19 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF905 (Similar To) 2017-02-13 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections