MN HF10 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Sexual harassment definition clarified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual harassment definition clarified.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 113 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House: Amendment to Moller Amendment (Y: 52 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 113 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 52 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2019-03-25SenateIntroduction and first reading
2019-03-25SenateReceived from House
2019-03-21HouseBill was passed as amended
2019-03-21HouseThird reading as amended
2019-03-21HouseAmended
2019-03-20HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 21, 2019
2019-02-11HouseSecond reading
2019-02-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-01-10HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division

Same As/Similar To

SF1307 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0010&ssn=0&y=2019
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF10&version=0&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF10&version=1&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0010&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10087
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0010&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10088
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0010&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10087
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0010&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10088

Bill Comments

feedback