MN HF10 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

MNsure transition to a federally facilitated marketplace required, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MNsure transition to a federally facilitated marketplace required, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-07HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
2017-03-06HouseAuthor added Christensen.
2017-03-02HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy
2017-02-22HouseAuthor added Davids.
2017-01-09HouseAuthors added Scott; Lohmer; Baker; McDonald; Drazkowski; Zerwas; Pugh; Urdahl; Bahr, C.; and Whelan.
2017-01-05HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform

Same As/Similar To

SF1148 (Similar To) 2017-02-20 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback