MN HF1 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Greenman
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Greenman
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Economic assistance provided for housing, MFIP, food, and broadband; funding provided; and money appropriated.
Title
Economic assistance provided for housing, MFIP, food, and broadband; funding provided; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Greenman |
2021-02-04 | House | Author added Lippert |
2021-01-28 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2021-01-25 | House | Authors added Thompson and Bernardy |
2021-01-21 | House | Author added Jordan |
2021-01-19 | House | Author added Hassan |
2021-01-14 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2021-01-11 | House | Authors added Youakim, Reyer |
2021-01-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF474 (Similar To) 2021-02-04 - Authors added Dziedzic; Torres Ray; Fateh