MN HF1 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-14 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance Division
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-14 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance Division
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Early childhood; additional funding and opportunities created for children ages birth to three; programs and funding for prenatal care services, home visiting, early childhood education, and child care assistance governed; and money appropriated.
Title
Early childhood; additional funding and opportunities created for children ages birth to three; programs and funding for prenatal care services, home visiting, early childhood education, and child care assistance governed; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance Division |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee report, without further rec to amend, re-refer to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2020-03-03 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2020-02-20 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred by Chair to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division |
2019-01-14 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF820 (Similar To) 2019-02-04 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy