MI SJRS | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; hunting; right to hunt, trap, and fish; recognize in constitution. Amends the state constitution by adding sec. 28 to art. I.
Title
Natural resources; hunting; right to hunt, trap, and fish; recognize in constitution. Amends the state constitution by adding sec. 28 to art. I.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Adopted By 2/3 Vote Roll Call # 122 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2013-04-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-04-25 | House | Received On 04/25/2013 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Adopted By 2/3 Vote Roll Call # 122 Yeas 25 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Introduced By Senator David Hildenbrand |