MI SCR0025 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to memorialize the Congress of the United States to expand federal tax exemptions and contribution limits for state-sponsored education savings accounts and to allow federal education funding to be deposited into student-specific education savings accounts.
Title
A concurrent resolution to memorialize the Congress of the United States to expand federal tax exemptions and contribution limits for state-sponsored education savings accounts and to allow federal education funding to be deposited into student-specific education savings accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-12-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Education Reform |
2017-12-06 | House | Received In House |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Resolutions |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Patrick Colbeck |