MI SCR0015 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Referred To Secretary For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Referred To Secretary For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to waive the legislative notice requirement for increases in rates of compensation for certain employees in the state classified service.
Title
A concurrent resolution to waive the legislative notice requirement for increases in rates of compensation for certain employees in the state classified service.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Nofs [R] | Sen. Tonya Schuitmaker [R] | Sen. Patrick Colbeck [R] | Sen. David Knezek [D] |
Sen. Rick Jones [R] | Sen. Darwin Booher [R] | Sen. Goeff Hansen [R] | Sen. Judith Emmons [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Referred To Secretary For Record |
2015-06-16 | Senate | House Concurrence Received |
2015-06-11 | House | Adopted And Returned |
2015-06-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-06-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2015-06-04 | House | Received In House |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Resolutions |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Mike Nofs |