MI SCR0010 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Referred To Secretary For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Referred To Secretary For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to observe the 150th anniversary of the laying of the cornerstone of the Michigan State Capitol.
Title
A concurrent resolution to observe the 150th anniversary of the laying of the cornerstone of the Michigan State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-10 | Senate | Referred To Secretary For Record |
2023-10-10 | Senate | House Concurrence Received |
2023-10-05 | House | Returned To Senate |
2023-10-05 | House | Adopted |
2023-10-04 | House | Postponed For The Day |
2023-10-04 | House | Received In House |
2023-10-03 | Senate | Entire Membership Of The Senate And Lieutenant Governor Named Co-sponsors |
2023-10-03 | Senate | Adopted |
2023-10-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-10-03 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Winnie Brinks |