MI SB1239 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0620'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Education; financing; strict discipline academy access to long-term borrowing abilities; provide for. Amends secs. 1311b & 1311h of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1311b & 380.1311h).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; financing; strict discipline academy access to long-term borrowing abilities; provide for. Amends secs. 1311b & 1311h of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1311b & 380.1311h).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 774 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 716 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31SenateAssigned Pa 0620'12
2012-12-31SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 1/9/2013 @ 4:06 Pm
2012-12-31SenateApproved By Governor 1/8/2013 @ 8:48 Pm
2012-12-31SenatePresented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 1:00 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-13SenateOrdered Enrolled
2012-12-13SenateFull Title Agreed To
2012-12-13SenateImmediate Effect Defeated
2012-12-13SenateHouse Inserted Full Title
2012-12-12HouseReturned To Senate
2012-12-12HouseInserted Full Title
2012-12-12HousePassed Roll Call # 774 Yeas 106 Nays 3
2012-12-12HouseRead A Third Time
2012-12-11HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-12-11HouseRead A Second Time
2012-12-05HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-12-05HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2012-11-08HouseReferred To Committee On Education
2012-11-08HouseRead A First Time
2012-11-08HouseReceived On 10/17/2012
2012-10-17SenatePassed Roll Call # 716 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2012-10-17SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2012-10-17SenateRules Suspended
2012-10-17SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2012-10-17SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2012-10-17SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2012-09-27SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2012-09-27SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2012-09-27SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2012-09-11SenateReferred To Committee On Education

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2012-SB-1239
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2012-SIB-1239.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2012-SEBS-1239.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2012-SEBH-1239.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2012-SNB-1239.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0620.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-09-27-069.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-10-17-070.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-05-078.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-12-081.htm

Bill Comments

feedback