MI SB1238 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 603'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 603'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; other; general amendments to the Michigan election law; provide for. Amends secs. 2, 3, 31a, 491, 495, 497, 498, 500d, 509w, 509x, 523a, 759, 761, 765, 811, 813 & 829 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.2 et seq.); adds secs. 493a, 499e & 761b & repeals secs. 524 & 758 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.524 & 168.758).
Title
Elections; other; general amendments to the Michigan election law; provide for. Amends secs. 2, 3, 31a, 491, 495, 497, 498, 500d, 509w, 509x, 523a, 759, 761, 765, 811, 813 & 829 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.2 et seq.); adds secs. 493a, 499e & 761b & repeals secs. 524 & 758 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.524 & 168.758).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1027 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 938 (Y: 57 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 717 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 938 (Y: 57 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 717 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 603'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 5:18 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/28/2018 @ 1:47 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2018 @ 12:48 Pm |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Roll Call # 1027 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-20 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 938 Yeas 57 Nays 51 |
2018-12-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-20 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-20 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-12-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2018-12-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2018-12-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-12-06 | House | Received On 12/06/2018 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 717 Yeas 26 Nays 10 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Michael Kowall |
Subjects
Elections: absent voters
Elections: ballots
Elections: election officials
Elections: other
Elections: registration
Elections: ballots
Elections: election officials
Elections: other
Elections: registration