MI SB1198 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Vetoed By Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Vetoed By Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Health; abortion; physical examination requirements; eliminate sunset. Amends sec. 17017 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17017).
Title
Health; abortion; physical examination requirements; eliminate sunset. Amends sec. 17017 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17017).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 841 (Y: 62 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 633 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 633 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | Vetoed By Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/28/2018 @ 9:30 Am |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-13 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 841 Yeas 62 Nays 47 |
2018-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-11-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2018-11-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-11-29 | House | Received On 11/29/2018 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 633 Yeas 25 Nays 12 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Thomas Casperson |