MI SB1177 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 629'18 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 629'18 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Veterans; other; Michigan State Capitol Commission; provide recognition in the State Capitol Building for veterans and eliminate the report from the former custodian of the Michigan veterans' headquarters. Amends title & secs. 1 & 2 of 1897 PA 8 (MCL 35.231 & 35.232).
Title
Veterans; other; Michigan State Capitol Commission; provide recognition in the State Capitol Building for veterans and eliminate the report from the former custodian of the Michigan veterans' headquarters. Amends title & secs. 1 & 2 of 1897 PA 8 (MCL 35.231 & 35.232).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 923 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 610 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 610 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 629'18 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 6:10 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/28/2018 @ 4:37 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/26/2018 @ 3:14 Pm |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 923 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-12-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-11-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Military And Veterans Affairs |
2018-11-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-11-28 | House | Received On 11/28/2018 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 610 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Margaret O'brien |