MI SB1175 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-19 - Assigned Pa 369'18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-19 - Assigned Pa 369'18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Labor; benefits; paid sick leave; eliminate presumptions against employers, and modify recordkeeping provisions. Amends secs. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 7, 8, 10, 11 & 14 of 2018 PA 338 (MCL 408.961 et seq.) & repeals secs. 6, 9 & 13 of 2018 PA 338 (MCL 408.966 et seq.).
Title
Labor; benefits; paid sick leave; eliminate presumptions against employers, and modify recordkeeping provisions. Amends secs. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 7, 8, 10, 11 & 14 of 2018 PA 338 (MCL 408.961 et seq.) & repeals secs. 6, 9 & 13 of 2018 PA 338 (MCL 408.966 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 679 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 675 (Y: 60 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 605 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 675 (Y: 60 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 605 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-19 | Senate | Assigned Pa 369'18 |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2018 @ 2:36 Pm |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/13/2018 @ 6:02 Pm |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/5/2018 @ 9:30 Am |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Roll Call # 679 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | House Substitute H-4 Concurred In |
2018-12-04 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-04 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-04 | House | Passed Roll Call # 675 Yeas 60 Nays 48 |
2018-12-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-04 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-04 | House | Substitute H-4 Adopted |
2018-12-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-11-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2018-11-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-11-28 | House | Received On 11/28/2018 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 605 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Mike Shirkey |
Subjects
Labor: benefits
Labor: fair employment practices
Labor: health and safety
Labor: hours and wages
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Labor: fair employment practices
Labor: health and safety
Labor: hours and wages
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs