MI SB1165 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Assigned Pa 0414'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Assigned Pa 0414'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor; other; alternating proprietorship, approved tasting room, bottle, brandy manufacturer, and brewer; add or modify definitions. Amends sec. 105 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1105). TIE BAR WITH: SB 1154'18, SB 1155'18, SB 1156'18, SB 1159'18, SB 1160'18, SB 1161'18, SB 1164'18, SB 1166'18
Title
Liquor; other; alternating proprietorship, approved tasting room, bottle, brandy manufacturer, and brewer; add or modify definitions. Amends sec. 105 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1105). TIE BAR WITH: SB 1154'18, SB 1155'18, SB 1156'18, SB 1159'18, SB 1160'18, SB 1161'18, SB 1164'18, SB 1166'18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 804 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 648 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 648 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0414'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/19/2018 @ 3:34 Pm |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/19/2018 @ 12:05 Pm |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/17/2018 @ 4:56 Pm |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 804 Yeas 106 Nays 2 |
2018-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-11-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2018-11-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-11-29 | House | Received On 11/29/2018 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 648 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rebekah Warren |
Subjects
Liquor: beer
Liquor: distribution
Liquor: manufacturer
Liquor: other
Liquor: spirits
Liquor: wine
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Liquor: distribution
Liquor: manufacturer
Liquor: other
Liquor: spirits
Liquor: wine
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs