MI SB1160 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0333'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0333'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health facilities: certificate of need; certificate of need for extended care services program; modify. Amends sec. 22210 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.22210).
Title
Health facilities: certificate of need; certificate of need for extended care services program; modify. Amends sec. 22210 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.22210).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 554 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 442 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 442 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0333'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2020 03:18 Pm |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/29/2020 12:30 Pm |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/21/2020 04:02 Pm |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-12-16 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-16 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 554 Yeas 106 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-12-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-16 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-12-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2020-12-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-12-04 | House | Received On 12/04/2020 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 442 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Outman |
Subjects
Health facilities: certificate of need
Health facilities: hospitals
State agencies (existing): health and human services
Health facilities: hospitals
State agencies (existing): health and human services