MI SB1158 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0562'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0562'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Water; quality; transfer of money from the Great Lakes water quality bond fund; modify distributions. Amends sec. 19708 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.19708). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5673'12, SB 1155'12, SB 1156'12, SB 1157'12
Title
Water; quality; transfer of money from the Great Lakes water quality bond fund; modify distributions. Amends sec. 19708 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.19708). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5673'12, SB 1155'12, SB 1156'12, SB 1157'12
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 938 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 719 (Y: 68 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 737 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 719 (Y: 68 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 737 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-10-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0562'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/2/2013 @ 5:18 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/2/2013 @ 1:17 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/21/2012 @ 10:32 Am |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Roll Call # 938 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-12 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-06 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-06 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 719 Yeas 68 Nays 40 |
2012-12-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-12-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-11-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-11-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-11-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation |
2012-11-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-08 | House | Received On 11/08/2012 |
2012-11-08 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 737 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |
Same As/Similar To
HB5676 (Same As) 2012-11-28 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes