MI SB1121 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0589'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Vehicles; agricultural equipment; definition of implement of husbandry; revise, and eliminate prohibition on carrying a passenger on a moped. Amends secs. 21, 59, 73 & 658 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.21 et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles; agricultural equipment; definition of implement of husbandry; revise, and eliminate prohibition on carrying a passenger on a moped. Amends secs. 21, 59, 73 & 658 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.21 et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1042 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 738 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 552 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31SenateAssigned Pa 0589'12
2012-12-31SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 1/7/2013 @ 1:33 Pm
2012-12-31SenateApproved By Governor 1/7/2013 @ 10:15 Am
2012-12-31SenatePresented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 2:06 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-13SenateOrdered Enrolled
2012-12-13SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2012-12-13SenateImmediate Effect Defeated
2012-12-13Senate Roll Call # 1042 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2012-12-13SenateHouse Substitute H-5 Concurred In
2012-12-13SenateHouse Amended Title
2012-12-12HouseReturned To Senate
2012-12-12HouseTitle Amended
2012-12-12HousePassed Roll Call # 738 Yeas 107 Nays 1
2012-12-12HouseRead A Third Time
2012-12-11HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-12-11HouseSubstitute H-5 Adopted
2012-12-11HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2012-12-11HouseRead A Second Time
2012-09-27HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-09-27HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2012-06-14HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation
2012-06-14HouseRead A First Time
2012-06-14HouseReceived On 06/14/2012
2012-06-14SenateTitle Amended
2012-06-14SenatePassed Roll Call # 552 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2012-06-14SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2012-06-14SenateRules Suspended
2012-06-14SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended
2012-06-14SenateSubstitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In
2012-06-14SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s)
2012-06-13SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2012-06-13SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2012-06-13SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2012-05-09SenateReferred To Committee On Transportation

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2012-SB-1121
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2012-SIB-1121.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2012-SEBS-1121.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2012-SEBH-1121.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2012-SNB-1121.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0589.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-06-13-059.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-06-14-060.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-09-27-071.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-12-081.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-12-13-080.htm

Bill Comments

feedback