MI SB1113 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0594'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0594'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; school districts; school district policy regarding child sex abuse and suggested instruction and training in child sex abuse prevention; provide for. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1505. TIE BAR WITH: SB 1112'12, SB 1114'12
Title
Education; school districts; school district policy regarding child sex abuse and suggested instruction and training in child sex abuse prevention; provide for. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1505. TIE BAR WITH: SB 1112'12, SB 1114'12
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1082 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 871 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 590 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-07-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 871 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 590 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-07-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0594'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/9/2013 @ 3:14 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/8/2013 @ 8:24 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 3:06 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Roll Call # 1082 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-14 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-14 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-14 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 871 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2012-12-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-14 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-14 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-12-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-07-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2012-07-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-07-18 | House | Received On 07/18/2012 |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 590 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
Subjects
Children, abuse or neglect
Crimes, crimes against minors
Crimes, criminal sexual conduct
Education, curricula
Education, school districts
Crimes, crimes against minors
Crimes, criminal sexual conduct
Education, curricula
Education, school districts