MI SB1097 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 18 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-30 - Pocket Veto 01/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 18 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-30 - Pocket Veto 01/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Michigan business tax: credits; time frame for completion of certain multiphase projects; modify. Amends sec. 437 of 2007 PA 36 (MCL 208.1437).
Title
Michigan business tax: credits; time frame for completion of certain multiphase projects; modify. Amends sec. 437 of 2007 PA 36 (MCL 208.1437).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 615 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 614 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 611 (Y: 62 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 366 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 614 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 611 (Y: 62 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 366 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Pocket Veto 01/05/2021 |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/22/2020 11:48 Am |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Enrollment Vacated |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 615 Yeas 34 Nays 3 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 614 Yeas 33 Nays 3 Excused 1 Not Voting 1 |
2020-12-18 | Senate | House Substitute (h-2) Concurred In |
2020-12-17 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-17 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 611 Yeas 62 Nays 43 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-17 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-16 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2020-12-16 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2020-12-16 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-09-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2020-09-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-09-30 | House | Received On 09/30/2020 |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 366 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne A. Schmidt |