MI SB1097 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-30 - Presented To Governor 12/29/2016 @ 4:26 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-30 - Presented To Governor 12/29/2016 @ 4:26 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Veterans; veterans' homes; reference to Michigan veterans' facility authority; provide for. Amends sec. 2a of 1885 PA 152 (MCL 36.2a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5919'16, SB 1100'16
Title
Veterans; veterans' homes; reference to Michigan veterans' facility authority; provide for. Amends sec. 2a of 1885 PA 152 (MCL 36.2a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5919'16, SB 1100'16
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 828 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 708 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 656 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 708 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 656 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-30 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/29/2016 @ 4:26 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2016-12-15 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 828 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-12-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 708 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2016-12-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-14 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-12-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-14 | House | Amended |
2016-12-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-12-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-12-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-12-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2016-12-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-12-01 | House | Received On 12/01/2016 |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 656 Yeas 24 Nays 12 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Peter Macgregor |
Same As/Similar To
HB5920 (Same As) 2016-09-22 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/21/2016