MI SB1097 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-19 - Postponed For The Day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-19 - Postponed For The Day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; economic development corporations; certified technology park distinct geographic areas; increase. Amends sec. 12b of 1986 PA 281 (MCL 125.2162b).
Title
Economic development; economic development corporations; certified technology park distinct geographic areas; increase. Amends sec. 12b of 1986 PA 281 (MCL 125.2162b).
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Jansen [R] | Sen. Arlan Meekhof [R] | Sen. Dave Hildenbrand [R] | Sen. John Proos [R] |
Sen. Phillip Pavlov [R] | Sen. John Pappageorge [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 741 (Y: 81 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 676 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-11-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 676 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-11-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | House | Postponed For The Day |
2014-12-19 | House | Vote On Passage Reconsidered |
2014-12-18 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 741 Yeas 81 Nays 28 |
2014-12-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-12-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2014-12-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-12-02 | House | Received On 11/13/2014 |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 676 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-11-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-11-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-11-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Mark Jansen |