MI SB1085 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0278'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0278'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance: other; actuarial opinion regarding reserves included in audited financial statements; expand time limit to include. Amends sec. 7040 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.7040).
Title
Insurance: other; actuarial opinion regarding reserves included in audited financial statements; expand time limit to include. Amends sec. 7040 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.7040).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 443 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-09-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0278'22 |
2022-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2022 01:48 Pm |
2022-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/29/2022 01:10 Pm |
2022-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/28/2022 02:42 Pm |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-12-08 | House | Returned To Senate |
2022-12-08 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2022-12-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 509 Yeas 90 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 12 |
2022-12-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-12-08 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-12-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-12-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-12-07 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2022-12-07 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-12-07 | House | Rule Suspended |
2022-09-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Rules And Competitiveness |
2022-09-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-09-28 | House | Received On 09/28/2022 |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 443 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Kimberly A. Lasata |