MI SB1049 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-18 - Referred To Committee On Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-18 - Referred To Committee On Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; wreckers; incentives for or from local governments for wrecker, recovery, or towing services; prohibit. Amends sec. 676d of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.676d).
Title
Vehicles; wreckers; incentives for or from local governments for wrecker, recovery, or towing services; prohibit. Amends sec. 676d of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.676d).
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Stamas [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 791 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2018-12-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-12-18 | House | Received On 12/18/2018 |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 791 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Stamas |