MI SB1048 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0395'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure: sentencing; rebuttable presumption for nonjail and nonprobationary sentences in certain misdemeanor cases; create. Amends secs. 5 & 34 ch. IX of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 769.5 & 769.34).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure: sentencing; rebuttable presumption for nonjail and nonprobationary sentences in certain misdemeanor cases; create. Amends secs. 5 & 34 ch. IX of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 769.5 & 769.34).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 601 (Y: 92 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 426 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-30SenateAssigned Pa 0395'20
2020-12-30SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 01/04/2021 01:22 Pm
2020-12-30SenateApproved By Governor 01/04/2021 11:08 Am
2020-12-23SenatePresented To Governor 12/22/2020 04:39 Pm
2020-12-18SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-12-18SenateFull Title Agreed To
2020-12-17HouseReturned To Senate
2020-12-17HouseInserted Full Title
2020-12-17HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 601 Yeas 92 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
2020-12-17HouseRead A Third Time
2020-12-17HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-12-17HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-12-17HouseRead A Second Time
2020-12-17HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-12-17HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2020-12-08HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2020-12-08HouseRead A First Time
2020-12-04HouseReceived On 12/04/2020
2020-12-03SenatePassed Roll Call # 426 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-11-05SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
2020-11-05SenateSubstitute (s-2) Concurred In
2020-11-05SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2020-10-06SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
2020-10-06SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2020-07-23SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2020-07-23SenateIntroduced By Senator Sylvia Santana

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback