MI SB1021 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0329'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0329'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations: health professionals; reciprocity requirements for an individual licensed in Canada; modify. Amends sec. 16186 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16186).
Title
Health occupations: health professionals; reciprocity requirements for an individual licensed in Canada; modify. Amends sec. 16186 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16186).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 531 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 376 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 376 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0329'20 |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0329'20 |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2020 03:10 Pm |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/29/2020 11:22 Am |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/21/2020 12:30 Pm |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2020-12-16 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-16 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 531 Yeas 107 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-12-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-09-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-09-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-09-30 | House | Received On 09/30/2020 |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 376 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne A. Schmidt |
Subjects
Health occupations: health professionals
Occupations: individual licensing and registration
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Occupations: individual licensing and registration
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs