MI SB1021 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0491'16 12/30/16 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0491'16 12/30/16 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Children; services; children's advocacy centers to have access to confidential records; allow under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 2, 7 & 8 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.622 et seq.).
Title
Children; services; children's advocacy centers to have access to confidential records; allow under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 2, 7 & 8 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.622 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 650 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 525 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 525 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0491'16 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/6/2017 @ 1:26 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/5/2017 @ 11:49 Am 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2016 @ 1:30 Pm |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2016-12-13 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-12-13 | House | Passed Roll Call # 650 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2016-12-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-11-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-11-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-09-22 | House | Per Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-09-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2016-09-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-09-21 | House | Received On 09/21/2016 |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 525 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2016-09-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2016-09-20 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-09-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Stamas |